This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 06:10:20 (UTC).

PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC VS. SABRINA MEDRANO

Case Summary

On 01/27/2016 PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SABRINA MEDRANO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC

Defendants

SABRINA MEDRANO

SUSIE JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11912302 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11736519.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11912302 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11736519.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 02/19/2016) FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 02/19/2016) FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 02/19/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 02/19/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11922962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747159.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11922962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747159.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 03/11/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11922962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747159.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 02/19/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 02/19/2016) FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1305641 RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016 04:38:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11912302 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11736519.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC LOS ALISOS, LLC ON 01/27/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1301917 RECEIVED ON 01/27/2016 02:17:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Los Alisos LLC is a litigant