This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 08:54:30 (UTC).

PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC VS. KUNZIK & SARA CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KUNZIK SARA CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Cross Defendants and Defendants

KUNZIK & SARA CONSTRUCTION, INC., a California corporation

WATERFRONT HOTELS, C, LLC, a California limited liability company

The Waterfront Hotel, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lanak and Hanna, P.C.

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Palomar Law Group

RUTAN & TUCKER

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/27/2022 11:12:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/27/2022 11:12:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822098.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822098.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 01/12/2022.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 01/12/2022.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/11/2022 09:20:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/11/2022 09:20:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2022 12:22:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/06/2022 12:22:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/27/2021 01:42:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/27/2021 01:42:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/03/2021 08:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/03/2021 08:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 11/24/2021

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 11/24/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/22/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/22/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12973831 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12801748.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12973831 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12801748.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE WATERFRONT HOTEL, LLC ON 11/18/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE WATERFRONT HOTEL, LLC ON 11/18/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/18/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/18/2021 01:30:00 PM.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WATERFRONT HOTELS, C, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/16/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WATERFRONT HOTELS, C, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 11/16/2021

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/27/2022 11:12:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994185 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822098.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1938865 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2022 05:36:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 01/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO CX101 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 01/31/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO CX101 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 03/06/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/11/2022 09:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE GLENDA SANDERS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21060722 RECEIVED ON 09/02/2021 09:47:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1884746 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2021 08:57:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/21/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12929354 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12757241.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21052614 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2021 09:09:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 08/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC CARPETS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC CARPETS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE WATERFRONT HOTEL LLC is a litigant