This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/11/2023 at 03:40:25 (UTC).

P. B. VS. DOE 1

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 P B filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

P. B.

Defendant

DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13146282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12974379.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13146282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12974379.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/06/2022 07:41:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/06/2022 07:41:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/03/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/03/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY B., P. ON 02/03/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY B., P. ON 02/03/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY B., P. ON 02/03/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY B., P. ON 02/03/2023

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY B., P. ON 02/03/2023

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY B., P. ON 02/03/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003134.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003134.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/06/2023 09:47:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/06/2023 09:47:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/06/2023 09:56:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/06/2023 09:56:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION - OTHER; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/06/2023 09:56:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/27/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/06/2023 09:47:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketTHE MOTION - OTHER IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13175028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13003134.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11097777 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2023 05:04:51 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/06/2022 07:41:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 05/11/2023 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 03/09/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13146282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12974379.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41416657 RECEIVED ON 11/29/2022 07:18:38 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 11/29/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY B., P. ON 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less