This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:16 (UTC).

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY VS. SCHNEIDER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCHNEIDER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTIT

Defendant

MICHAEL SCHNEIDER

Assignee

ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 07/17/2017; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 12/15/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 12/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 08/26/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 07/13/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 07/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/01/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929589 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753807.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less