This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/07/2017 03:49:47

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Orthopaedic Specialty Institute Medical Group Of Orange County against Paredes in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number **********************-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Orthopaedic Specialty Instit
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Broderick Paredes
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
  • 08/26/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
  • 08/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
  • 08/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.
  • 06/01/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 06/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/01/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/01/2016
  • 03/02/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929571 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753789.
  • 03/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.