This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:41 (UTC).

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY VS. GREENE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GREENE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTIT

Defendant

PAMELA GREENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/16/2017; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12119491 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11943314.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DECLARATION OF LOST WRIT FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 01/30/2017; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 01/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 01/30/2017; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 01/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12054553 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11878498.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 10/07/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 10/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 08/26/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 08/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 08/26/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/01/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929545 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753763.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/03/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.