This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:34 (UTC).

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY VS. FURRY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FURRY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTIT

Defendant

PATRICK FURRY

Assignee

ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. ON 05/25/2017; Filing Party: ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. ON 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. ON 04/11/2017; Filing Party: ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. ON 04/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12001900 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11825968.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 06/01/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/01/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 04/05/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 03/25/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALTY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY A FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11929470 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11753688.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALITY INSTITUTE MEDICAL GROUP OF ORANGE COUNTY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.