Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/19/2021 at 07:19:44 (UTC).

ORLANDO GARCIA VS. R.C. HOTELS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 ORLANDO GARCIA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against R C HOTELS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orlando Garcia

Defendant

R.C. Hotels, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Center for Disability Access

Defendant Attorneys

Miles L. Prince

David L. Prince

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12848972 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12676622.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12848972 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12676622.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY R.C. HOTELS, INC. ON 02/10/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY R.C. HOTELS, INC. ON 02/10/2021

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/27/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/27/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12827331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12654510.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12827331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12654510.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12848972 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12676622.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1811757 RECEIVED ON 02/10/2021 05:08:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY R.C. HOTELS, INC. ON 02/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3975611 RECEIVED ON 01/27/2021 11:02:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12827331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12654510.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2971358 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2021 11:38:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, ORLANDO ON 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RC Hotels (Virgin Islands), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE MILES L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE DAVID LOUIS