This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 07:35:24 (UTC).

ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. DAVID VOLZ DESIGN LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID VOLZ DESIGN LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orange Unified School District

Defendants

David Volz Design Landscape Architects, Inc.

Kya Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tao Rossini, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/31/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/31/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/12/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/12/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/20/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/20/2021

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 08/23/2021

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 08/23/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: ZELTZER; Department: C34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1885542 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2021 02:27:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 08/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41231131 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2021 09:38:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21052589 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2021 08:26:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/31/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21049661 RECEIVED ON 08/04/2021 06:13:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 08/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where KYA SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant