This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:46 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY VS. JUAN MANUEL ROSELL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY filed an Other lawsuit against JUAN MANUEL ROSELL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Respondent

JUAN MANUEL ROSELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREENBAUM LAW GROUP, LLP

 

Court Documents

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/26/2016

PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/26/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/29/16) RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/29/16) RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 11/21/2016

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 11/21/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 03/02/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 03/02/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 11/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 11/29/16) RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3481659 RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016 09:36:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FOR ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY IN THE AMOUNT OF 8153.68 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST ROSELL, JUAN MANUEL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION - NEW CASE INITIATION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509504 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:04:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.