This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:11 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS VS. SOUSAN ALEMANSOUR

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUSAN ALEMANSOUR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS

Defendant

SOUSAN ALEMANSOUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 07/01/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 07/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 05/17/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 05/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751865.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.