This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:50 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS VS. SCODELLER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCODELLER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS

Defendants

DANIEL SCHODELLER

DANIEL SCODELLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 05/06/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 05/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927628 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751853.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.