This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:18 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS VS. MANDANA ASALKHOU

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANDANA ASALKHOU. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS

Defendant

MANDANA ASALKHOU

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 12/04/2017; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 06/09/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 03/30/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 03/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927637 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751862.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.