This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:40 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS VS. LINDA SOBH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LINDA SOBH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS

Defendant

LINDA SOBH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 06/02/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 06/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 05/26/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 05/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927627 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751852.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less