This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:13 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS VS. EDGAR MENDAROS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDGAR MENDAROS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS

Defendant

EDGAR MENDAROS

Assignee

ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT ON WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULL FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 01/18/2017; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 01/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. ON 09/06/2016; Filing Party: ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. ON 09/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT, 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12017795 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11841852.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 08/18/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 08/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 06/09/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 04/11/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 04/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927634 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751859.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY DIAGNOSTICS ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less