This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:48:32 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS. RAUL ERICK ROSAS ROJAS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAUL ERICK ROSAS ROJAS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

RAUL ERICK ROSAS ROJAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/31/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234654 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058333.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600465 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 06:56:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.