This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 19:01:27 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS. JORGE CORNEJO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JORGE CORNEJO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

JORGE CORNEJO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 12/19/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/19/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/02/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058574.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600468 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 07:41:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.