This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 19:05:36

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc against Javier Arizaga in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 10/10/2017
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Javier Arizaga
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Oportun Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 12/14/2017; Filing Party: OPO
  • 11/28/2017
  • REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/28/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/28/2017
  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)
  • 11/22/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/22/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/22
  • 11/22/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED
  • 11/22/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.
  • 11/22/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/22/2017 08:30:00 AM.
  • 10/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/26/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/26/2017
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234907 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058586.
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600467 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 07:39:56 PM.
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.