This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:49:26 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS. JAQUELINE SOTELO GAMA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAQUELINE SOTELO GAMA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

JAQUELINE SOTELO GAMA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 01/22/2018; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 01/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FREGOSO, SENDI FOR 08 - REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING IF DEFENDANT SERVED IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12285682 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12109416.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 01/22/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 07/10/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/10/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/22/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PANAMENO, WALTER FOR 08 - REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING IF DEFENDANT SERVED IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12080916.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/22/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/22/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 01/22/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. PLAINTIFF TO PAY CONTINUANCE FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4787243 RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017 10:01:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/14/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234912 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775527 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 07:57:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.