This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 18:53:15

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc against Israel Hernandez Penaloza in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-NJC
  • Filing Date 10/10/2017
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse North Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Oportun Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Israel Hernandez Penaloza
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 12/19/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 12/19
  • 12/19/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
  • 12/19/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
  • 12/19/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.
  • 12/19/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/19/2017 08:30:00 AM.
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058081.
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775522 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 06:30:43 PM.
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.