This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:48:01 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS. GUILLERMO MARTINEZ TORRES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUILLERMO MARTINEZ TORRES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

GUILLERMO MARTINEZ TORRES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/21/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/21/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3608100 RECEIVED ON 11/15/2017 02:14:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/15/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057983.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775521 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 06:08:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.