This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 18:57:09

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Oportun Inc against Arturo Jaime Peralta in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-NJC
  • Filing Date 10/10/2017
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse North Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Arturo Jaime Peralta
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Oportun Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)
  • 12/13/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED
  • 12/13/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.
  • 12/13/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 12/13/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 12/13
  • 12/13/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/13/2017 08:30:00 AM.
  • 11/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE (AMENDED) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/02/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/02/2017
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058015.
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600462 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 06:25:11 PM.
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.