This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:48:28 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS. ARTEMIO RUIZ MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARTEMIO RUIZ MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

ARTEMIO RUIZ MARTINEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 03/15/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 01/18/2018; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 01/08/2018; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 01/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/18/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/08/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234973 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058652.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775528 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 08:06:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.