This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 19:00:21 (UTC).

OPORTUN INC. VS. ANA C PEREZ

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 OPORTUN INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANA C PEREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPORTUN INC.

Defendant

ANA C PEREZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/22/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/22/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2612128 RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017 09:53:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 11/14/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/22/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775523 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 06:47:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: OPORTUN INC. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.