This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/28/2023 at 03:48:07 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 VS. THU A TRAN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR 'ASF' WILMINGTON TRUST, N A , AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THU A TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onemain Financial Group, LLC As Servicer For ('ASF') Wilmington Trust, N.A., As Issuer Loan Trustee For Onemain Financial Issuance Trust 2020-1

Defendant

Thu A Tran

Westminster, CA 92683

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson & Kennard

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992309.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992309.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 02/22/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 02/22/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11115399 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2023 07:56:10 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 03/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41450960 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2023 03:51:40 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164212 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992309.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR ('ASF') WILMINGTON TRUST, N.A., AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST 2020-1 ON 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31256147 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2023 11:21:22 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less