This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 07:36:58 (UTC).

ODILON TRUJILLO VS. SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 ODILON TRUJILLO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maria J. Trujillo

Odilon Trujillo

Defendants

Affinia Default Services, LLC

Bank of New York Mellon

Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CDLG, PC

Defendant Attorney

McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975311 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803228.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975311 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803228.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED BY AFFINIA DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC ON 12/07/2021

DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED BY AFFINIA DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC ON 12/07/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21096977 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 10:19:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED BY AFFINIA DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31094520 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 02:32:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41272543 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 02:32:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY TRUJILLO, MARIA J.; TRUJILLO, ODILON ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21097226 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 02:32:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975311 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803228.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41267947 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2021 03:41:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 11/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TRUJILLO, ODILON; TRUJILLO, MARIA J. ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affina Default Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant