This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:17:59 (UTC).

OANH PHAN VS HOANG NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 OANH PHAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HOANG NGUYEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8266

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHAN, OANH KIEU

Respondent

NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HUNG NGUYEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 12/29/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/29/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • RESPONSE - AMENDED DISSOLUTION / LEGAL SEPARATION / NULLITY 11/22/2017 AS TO ATTY 6A,8B.C, 11A.C; Filing Party: NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/22/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/09/2017; Filing Party: PHAN, OANH KIEU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 11/09/2017; Filing Party: PHAN, OANH KIEU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/09/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/09/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 11/09/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: NGUYEN, HOANG HUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PHAN, OANH KIEU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PHAN, OANH KIEU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: PHAN, OANH KIEU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: PHAN, OANH KIEU

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.