This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:27 (UTC).

OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY VS. H&N MACHINE CO.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against H N MACHINE CO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

H&N MACHINE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCELLI LAW OFFICES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/30/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/30/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/25/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752325.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752325.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4569493 RECEIVED ON 06/30/2016 11:29:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4523610 RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016 02:41:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928100 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752325.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509756 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:57:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.