This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:44 (UTC).

OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION VS. CAROLINA GALANG

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CAROLINA GALANG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANC

Defendant

CAROLINA GALANG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 10/16/2013.; Filing Party: O POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 10/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/10/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 10/08/2013.; Filing Party: O POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 10/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 09/27/2013.; Filing Party: O POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SUBMITTED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION REJECTED ON 09/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION ON 09/25/2013; Filing Party: OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION ON 09/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431146 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: OAK CREEK VILLAGE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less