This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 10:57:25 (UTC).

NTHC, LLC. VS. CREST FOODS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 NTHC, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CREST FOODS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NTHC, LLC.

Defendants

Crest Foods Systems, Inc.

Crest Foods, Inc.

Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Riley Lagensen

Ziad S. Dalal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khan Law Group, L.C.

Defendant Attorneys

Zelms Erlich & Mack

Long & Levit LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 12/06/2022

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 12/06/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/01/2022 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/01/2022 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 12/02/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 12/02/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 11/16/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 11/16/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CREST FOODS, INC.; CREST FOODS SYSTEMS, INC.; DALAL, ZIAD S. ON 11/16/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CREST FOODS, INC.; CREST FOODS SYSTEMS, INC.; DALAL, ZIAD S. ON 11/16/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NTHC, LLC. ON 11/03/2022

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NTHC, LLC. ON 11/03/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41353814 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41353814 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/19/2022 10:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/19/2022 10:30:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 09/13/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 09/13/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/12/2022 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 09/12/2022 08:30:00 AM.

REPLY - OTHER FILED

REPLY - OTHER FILED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13103965 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12931967.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13103965 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12931967.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED

OPPOSITION FILED

OPPOSITION FILED

OPPOSITION FILED

OPPOSITION FILED

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CREST FOODS, INC.; CREST FOODS SYSTEMS, INC. ON 08/26/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CREST FOODS, INC.; CREST FOODS SYSTEMS, INC. ON 08/26/2022

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED; Judge: VU; Department: N15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: VU; Department: N15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41419624 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2022 03:04:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/01/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41418506 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2022 05:28:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROCEED IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2023 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT N15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/02/2023 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP ON 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DALAL, ZIAD S.; CREST FOODS, INC.; CREST FOODS SYSTEMS, INC. ON 06/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31142936 RECEIVED ON 04/11/2022 05:17:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NTHC, LLC. ON 04/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 03/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13027932 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12855913.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NTHC, LLC. ON 03/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NTHC, LLC. ON 03/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31138022 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2022 01:33:52 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crest Foods Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Davis Wright Tremaine LLP is a litigant