This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:21:37 (UTC).

NOREEN GASBARRO VS. MERCK, SHARP AND DOHME, CORP.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 NOREEN GASBARRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MERCK, SHARP AND DOHME, CORP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOREEN GASBARRO

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

MERCK, SHARP AND DOHME, CORP.

NORTHSTAR RX LLC

MERCK & CO., INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBINSON CALCAGNIE ROBINSON SHAPIRO DA

ROBINSON CALCAGNIE ROBINSON SHAPIRO DAVIS, INC.

Defendant Attorneys

SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

VENABLE LLP

 

Court Documents

PETITION - OTHER (FOR POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION) FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 09/19/2013

PETITION - OTHER (FOR POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION) FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 09/19/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/28/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11462477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11286369.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11462477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11286369.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255678.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255678.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY MERCK, SHARP AND DOHME, CORP. ON 09/18/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY MERCK, SHARP AND DOHME, CORP. ON 09/18/2013

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PERK, STEVEN ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PERK, STEVEN ON 08/12/2013.

ORDER - OTHER (COORDINATING, STAYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTIONS) FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 10/23/2013

ORDER - OTHER (COORDINATING, STAYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTIONS) FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 10/23/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/28/2013

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2013
  • COORDINATED CASE JCCP 4644 EFFECTIVE 12/04/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (COORDINATING, STAYING AND TRANSFERRING ACTIONS) FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 10/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION - OTHER (FOR POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION) FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 09/19/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11462477 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11286369.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY MERCK, SHARP AND DOHME, CORP. ON 09/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2280635 RECEIVED ON 09/18/2013 04:24:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 470390 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013 07:01:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PERK, STEVEN ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11255678.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GASBARRO, NOREEN ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270837 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 04:24:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less