This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:20:11 (UTC).

NOEMI CARRILLO VS JESUS FLORES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 NOEMI CARRILLO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JESUS FLORES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8280

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARRILLO, NOEMI

Respondent

FLORES, JESUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/20/2018; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 04/20/2018; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 04/20/2018; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 04/20/2018; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/13/2018; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CARRILLO, NOEMI

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.