This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 03:43:41 (UTC).

NIKKI HATAMI VS. QUANG HUYNH

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 NIKKI HATAMI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QUANG HUYNH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nikki Hatami

Defendants

Quang Huynh

The Irvine Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pacific Attorney Group

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/31/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/31/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/01/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/01/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13055670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12883686.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13055670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12883686.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/27/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/27/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/27/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/27/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GAFFNEY; Department: N16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21165303 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2022 11:16:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41340356 RECEIVED ON 05/27/2022 02:26:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13055670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12883686.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/01/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N16 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HATAMI, NIKKI ON 05/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GAFFNEY, DONALD ON 05/27/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant