This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 03:49:43 (UTC).

NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE VS. HENRY F LUDWIG

Case Summary

On 01/14/2016 NIETO TRUST 3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HENRY F LUDWIG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

HENRY F LUDWIG

CHARLOTTE M LUDWIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN D. SILVERSTEIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11905709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11729930.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11905709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11729930.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 2/3/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 2/3/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11915503 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11739700.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11915503 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11739700.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 03/23/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 03/23/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11915503 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11739700.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 2/3/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 02/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4498903 RECEIVED ON 02/03/2016 11:49:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11905709 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11729930.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NIETO TRUST #3925, SOUTHLAND HOMES REAL ESTATE AND INVESTMENT LLC AS TRUSTEE ON 01/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4489609 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2016 08:49:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Silverstein