This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:39 (UTC).

NICOLE SCOTT VS. MACK DREZIN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 NICOLE SCOTT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MACK DREZIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINDA SCOTT

NICOLE SCOTT

Defendant

MACK DREZIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 09/27/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/16/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 09/27/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SCOTT, LINDA; SCOTT, NICOLE ON 07/25/2016; Filing Party: SCOTT, LINDA; SCOTT, NICOLE ON 07/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 08 - REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING IF DEFENDANT SERVED IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982950 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807035.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/16/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/14/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 08/16/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY SCOTT, LINDA; SCOTT, NICOLE ON 06/09/2016; Filing Party: SCOTT, LINDA; SCOTT, NICOLE ON 06/09/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY SCOTT, LINDA FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927095 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751320.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY SCOTT, NICOLE; SCOTT, LINDA ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: SCOTT, NICOLE; SCOTT, LINDA ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.