This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 03:32:17 (UTC).

NICHOLE LEE TAMAYO VS. PHOENIX ENTERPRISES INT'L, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 NICHOLE LEE TAMAYO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHOENIX ENTERPRISES INT'L, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLE LEE TAMAYO

Defendants

RYAN STIRES

PHOENIX ENTERPRISES INT'L, INC.

ROBERT T STIRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derrick Smalls

Evgeny Swarovski

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/24/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/24/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/24/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/24/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12541039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12364858.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12541039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12364858.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 04/24/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 04/24/2019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/26/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/16/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/16/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 08/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3822776 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2019 06:27:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 07/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1645417 RECEIVED ON 07/18/2019 08:49:18 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/16/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4963285 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2019 11:28:26 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 04/24/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12541039 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12364858.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TAMAYO, NICHOLE LEE ON 04/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1616223 RECEIVED ON 04/24/2019 03:57:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMALLS DERRICK WENDELL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWAROVSKI, EVGENY