This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 10:22:55 (UTC).

NICHOLE KEC VS. R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 NICHOLE KEC filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against R J REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLE KEC

Defendants

REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC

WILLIAM ROTH

R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

STACI MEYER

DANIEL HARRINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF NATALIE MIRZAYAN

Defendant Attorney

JONES DAY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 06/10/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 06/10/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12567221 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12391189.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12567221 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12391189.

ORDER GRANTING (MOTION TO COMPEL ARITRATION) FILED BY R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY ON 06/07/2019

ORDER GRANTING (MOTION TO COMPEL ARITRATION) FILED BY R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY ON 06/07/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4961875 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4961875 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4973249 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4973249 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4965428 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4965428 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/07/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/07/2019 10:00:00 AM.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 06/04/2019

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 06/04/2019

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 06/04/2019

MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 06/04/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1629095 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1629095 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12562539 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12386443.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12562539 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12386443.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 05/31/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 05/31/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 05/31/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 05/31/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION OF NATALIE MIRZAYAN) FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION OF NATALIE MIRZAYAN) FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 05/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/31/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/31/2019

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HARRINGTON, DANIEL; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY; REYNOLDS AMERICAN, INC; MEYER, STACI; ROTH, WILLIAM ON 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1632169 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2019 02:19:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12567221 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12391189.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING (MOTION TO COMPEL ARITRATION) FILED BY R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY ON 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1619649 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2019 03:43:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4961875 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4973249 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4965428 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/07/2019 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • THE ADR REVIEW HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX105.

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (OF NATALIE MIRZAYAN) FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 11/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (JUGE GLENDA SANDERS) FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 11/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1562157 RECEIVED ON 11/15/2018 08:56:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SANDERS, GLENDA ON 11/07/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12452254 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12275946.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KEC, NICHOLE ON 11/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1559500 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2018 10:59:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reynolds American, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where R J REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRZAYAN NATALIE