This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:45 (UTC).

NGUYEN VS. NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 NGUYEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NGUYEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNIE NGUYEN

Defendant

KRISTINE HOANG NGUYEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/22/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 06/22/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/25/2016 10:13:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DOE, JOHN FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751645.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509762 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:01:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY NGUYEN, ANNIE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: NGUYEN, ANNIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less