This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 05:26:21 (UTC).

NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP VS. MERRI AMBER WHITLOCK

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MERRI AMBER WHITLOCK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP

Defendants

MARIA PALMARI

MERRI AMBER WHITLOCK

PALMARI LAW FIRM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GERALD L. BASS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12100857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11924773.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12100857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11924773.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/01/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/01/2017.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 04/21/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 04/21/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 04/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3536928 RECEIVED ON 04/21/2017 02:54:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/01/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12100857 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11924773.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP ON 02/01/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3506088 RECEIVED ON 02/01/2017 02:54:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less