Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 04:01:44 (UTC).

NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC VS. ANDREW SIEMS

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDREW SIEMS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC

Defendants

ANDREW SIEMS

JULIE SIEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/26/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/26/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/17/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/17/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/17/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/17/2017.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/17/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/17/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082217 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906185.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082217 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906185.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/23/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/23/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/23/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/23/16) RECEIVED ON 12/23/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 12/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 12/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 12/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 12/23/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/10/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12072469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11896414.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12072469 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11896414.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/23/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/23/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/23/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/23/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12064945 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11888903.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12064945 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11888903.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/18/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/18/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/18/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/18/2016

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2017
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/17/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 04/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4709716 RECEIVED ON 04/17/2017 09:53:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 01/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4644697 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016 04:55:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3483108 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2016 12:07:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12064945 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11888903.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY NEWPORT BLUFFS LLC ON 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4637531 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2016 11:17:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Newport Bluffs LLC is a litigant