This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/05/2022 at 07:36:45 (UTC).

NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. VS. BOGART CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOGART CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neutra Builders, Inc.

Defendants

Bogart Construction, Inc.

Hudson Insurance Company

Old Republic Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carlton & Alberola

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/12/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994200 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822113.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994200 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822113.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/14/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21110439 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2022 10:44:46 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12994200 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12822113.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1938774 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2022 03:56:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 01/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NEUTRA BUILDERS, INC. ON 01/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bogard Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant