This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 09:33:14 (UTC).

NEMA ESCARTIN VS. GARY MATTHEW JONES

Case Summary

On 02/16/2016 NEMA ESCARTIN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARY MATTHEW JONES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

NEMA ESCARTIN

Defendant and Appellant

GARY MATTHEW JONES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - OTHER (EXHIBIT DISPOSITION CERTIFICATE) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/23/2018

NOTICE - OTHER (EXHIBIT DISPOSITION CERTIFICATE) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/23/2018

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/30/2017

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/30/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2017

REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/28/2016

REMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/28/2016

EXHIBIT LIST

EXHIBIT LIST

MINUTE ORDER FROM APPELLATE DIVISION

MINUTE ORDER FROM APPELLATE DIVISION

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS-APPELLATE DIVISION CASE 2016-00844825

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS-APPELLATE DIVISION CASE 2016-00844825

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 03/03/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 03/03/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY JONES, GARY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11748125.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY JONES, GARY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11748125.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JONES, GARY MATTHEW ON 02/22/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JONES, GARY MATTHEW ON 02/22/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11920907 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11745104.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11920907 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11745104.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (EXHIBIT DISPOSITION CERTIFICATE) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMITTITUR FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER FROM APPELLATE DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RECORDS-APPELLATE DIVISION CASE 2016-00844825

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/17/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY JONES, GARY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923918 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11748125.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JONES, GARY MATTHEW ON 02/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11920907 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11745104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ESCARTIN, NEMA ON 02/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4504043 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016 07:05:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less