Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 21:23:11 (UTC).

NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS. VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC.

VEDANTA LABORATORIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALISIAN LEE LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/25/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/25/2019

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 05/26/2020

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 05/26/2020

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 05/06/2019

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 05/06/2019

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/10/19) RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/10/19) RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3779805 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3779805 REJECTED.

JUDGMENT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

JUDGMENT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 03/18/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 03/18/2019 10:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 03/15/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/04/2019 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/04/2019 10:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 12/13/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 12/13/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3733463 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3733463 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 10/30/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 10/30/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 08/30/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 08/30/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/02/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/02/2018.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT, 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12550606 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12374466.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2791596 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019 02:29:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 05/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 5/10/19) RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 5/10/19) RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3779805 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4957523 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2019 04:22:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4881902 RECEIVED ON 08/30/2018 09:27:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 08/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3703192 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2018 11:43:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/04/2019 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12395742 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12219430.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3694768 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2018 03:30:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/02/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ON 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SATYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., a California corporation is a litigant