Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 23:06:52 (UTC).

NDR PACIFIC INC. VS. HEALTH NET, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2017 NDR PACIFIC INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEALTH NET, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Others and Cross Defendants

NDR PACIFIC INC.

Reiner Nusbaum

Maxim Management Group, Inc.

CRMW, Inc.

People for People, LLC

NDR Recovery, Inc

Mahyar Mohases

Other and Claimant

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

Defendants and Others

CENTENE CORPORATION

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK INC.

HEALTH NET, INC.

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

NDR PACIFIC INC.

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SEMNAR & HARTMAN, LLP

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

Khashayar Law Group

FitzGerald Yap Kreditor LLP

Defendant and Other Attorney

MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

SEMNAR & HARTMAN, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12734195 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12560474.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12734195 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12560474.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 05/26/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 05/26/2020

OBJECTION FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/23/2020

OBJECTION FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 04/23/2020

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION (-PROTECTIVE ORDER -) FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/29/2019

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION (-PROTECTIVE ORDER -) FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/29/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 09/19/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY NUSBAUM, REINER ON 09/19/2019

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 04/15/2019

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 04/15/2019

DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 04/15/2019

DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 04/15/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT 03/14/2019 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT 03/14/2019 02:00:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/13/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/13/2019

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HEALTH NET, INC.; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK INC.; CENTENE CORPORATION ON 12/27/2018

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY HEALTH NET, INC.; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK INC.; CENTENE CORPORATION ON 12/27/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/08/2018 02:50:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/08/2018 02:50:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12261180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12084880.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12261180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12084880.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 07/07/2017

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 07/07/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/29/2017 02:54:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/29/2017 02:54:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12165366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11989083.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE LEGAL, LLC FOR 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,000.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12165366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11989083.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2017 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/19/2017

NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/19/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/11/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/11/2017

255 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/30/2021 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/30/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 12/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41138271 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2020 09:58:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CENTENE CORPORATION; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET, INC.; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK INC. ON 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41136284 RECEIVED ON 11/25/2020 12:59:23 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41081161 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1738309 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
428 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC. ON 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3535869 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2017 02:18:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12138707 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11962490.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4706831 RECEIVED ON 04/11/2017 10:50:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 04/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NDR PACIFIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 04/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NDR Pacific, Inc. is a litigant