This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 05:55:44 (UTC).

NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. VS. JESUS W CABALLERO

Case Summary

On 05/02/2014 NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JESUS W CABALLERO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC.

Defendants

JESUS W CABALLERO

JOSE J CABALLERO

JESUS W. CABALLERO AS TRUSTEE OF THE J

JESUS W. CABALLERO AS TRUSTEE OF THE JESUS W. CABALLERO AND MARIA D. CABALLERO LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 5, 1996

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

Defendant Attorneys

CUMMINS & WHITE, LLP

MILLER BARONDESS, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 315.01, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11756107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11580281.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 315.01, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11756107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11580281.

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/04/2014

NOTICE - OTHER (OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/04/2014

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/21/2014

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/21/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/19/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/19/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4233652 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4233652 REJECTED.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/18/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/18/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/18/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/18/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11640352 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11464474.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11640352 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11464474.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER) FILED BY CABALLERO, JESUS W ON 08/08/2014

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER) FILED BY CABALLERO, JESUS W ON 08/08/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11625900 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11449961.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11625900 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11449961.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11607471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11431440.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 900.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11607471 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11431440.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CABALLERO, JESUS W; JESUS W. CABALLERO AS TRUSTEE OF THE JESUS W. CABALLERO AND MARIA D. CABALLERO LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 5, 1996 ON 06/09/2014

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CABALLERO, JESUS W; JESUS W. CABALLERO AS TRUSTEE OF THE JESUS W. CABALLERO AND MARIA D. CABALLERO LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 5, 1996 ON 06/09/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/28/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/28/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/28/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/28/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTERPLEADER DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 540,489.37, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11589062 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11413069.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTERPLEADER DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 540,489.37, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11589062 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11413069.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11587911 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11411930.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11587911 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11411930.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/02/2014

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/02/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/02/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/02/2014

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2015
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 318261 TO JESUS CABALLERO ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 315.01 DUE TO INTEREST PAYMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 315.01, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11756107 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11580281.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 317420 TO JOSE CABALLERO ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 315.01 DUE TO INTEREST PAYMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTEREST DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 315.01, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11726122 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11550384.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 10/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4268676 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2014 04:38:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 09/12/2014 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DISBURSEMENT ON TRUST 312655 TO JOSE J CABALLERO ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF 254,606.88 DUE TO COURT ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4196036 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2014 11:53:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF DEPOSIT OF INTERPLEADED FUNDS) FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR INTERPLEADER DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 540,489.37, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11589062 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11413069.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 05/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11587911 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11411930.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER FILED BY NATURE'S SUNSHINE PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3140785 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2014 11:43:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nature's Sunshine Products is a litigant