This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 11:23:43 (UTC).

NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. VS. SIT-CO LLC

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 NATIONAL FUNDING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SIT-CO LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.

Defendants

DANIEL KOLB

HERCULES INVESTMENTS LLC

THOMAS KOLB

SIT-CO LLC

HIGH AVAILABILITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NATIONAL FUNDING, INC.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12356382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12180122.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12356382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12180122.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 05/24/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 05/24/2018.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/25/2018

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/25/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/25/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/25/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE REASSIGNED TO LAYNE MELZER EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.

CASE REASSIGNED TO LAYNE MELZER EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 08/07/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 08/07/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3695986 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2018 10:03:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 09/21/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO LAYNE MELZER EFFECTIVE 07/30/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/21/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3671654 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2018 02:08:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 05/24/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12356382 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12180122.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4849104 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2018 08:23:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERCULES INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant