This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 17:38:35 (UTC).

NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. VS. DB EXPRESS LIMITED

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 NATIONAL FUNDING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DB EXPRESS LIMITED. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Funding, Inc.

Defendants

Db Express Limited

Kyle Baxter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E Hawley

Tara Muren

Jennifer E Duty

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779737.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779737.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/15/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/15/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/15/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/15/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41252747 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2021 11:06:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41252746 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2021 11:05:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21076980 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 12:11:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1905966 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 12:09:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/07/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 10/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12951832 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12779737.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31069141 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2021 08:10:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer E. Duty

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E. Hawley