This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 03:41:17 (UTC).

NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. VS. ACORN WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 NATIONAL FUNDING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACORN WELLNESS CENTER, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Funding, Inc.

Defendants

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER, LLC

Nicole Greenberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer E. Duty

Tara Muren

James E Hawley

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13014953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12842883.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13014953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12842883.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/12/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/12/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/21/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/13/2022

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/13/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/05/2022

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/05/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/05/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/05/2022

JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/06/2022

JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/06/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/04/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/04/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/03/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/03/2022

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21159084 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2022 12:38:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21155819 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2022 02:20:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41329977 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2022 11:35:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31152742 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2022 02:08:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41311971 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2022 11:36:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31126096 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2022 05:03:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13014953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12842883.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/12/2022 AT 09:30:00 AM IN N17 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. ON 03/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 03/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL FUNDING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer E. Duty