This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 03:41:49 (UTC).

NANCY NIETO AGUILAR VS. SANTA CATALINA HEALTHCARE, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 NANCY NIETO AGUILAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SANTA CATALINA HEALTHCARE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Nieto Aguilar

Defendants

Santa Catalina Healthcare, Inc.

The Ensign Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AEGIS LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13033990 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12862011.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13033990 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12862011.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 06/07/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 06/07/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2022 03:49:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2022 03:49:00 PM.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 05/16/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 05/16/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31165774 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2022 09:54:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 06/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1989141 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2022 03:54:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 05/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/05/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketTHE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/05/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/16/2022 03:49:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41321489 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2022 04:27:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13033990 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12862011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AGUILAR, NANCY NIETO ON 04/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 04/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant