This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:25 (UTC).

NANCY MCNAMARA VS. NEVEN GHABRIAL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 NANCY MCNAMARA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEVEN GHABRIAL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NANCY MCNAMARA

Defendant

NEVEN GHABRIAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • JUDGMENT PAYMENT INSTALLMENT INFORMATION HAS BEEN UPDATED TO N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/14/2016; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 07/07/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 07/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 06/28/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 06/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/21/2016 04:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1328467 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2016 03:28:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 06/20/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 06/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1314904 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 03/04/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 03/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/21/2016 AT 04:00:00 PM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DOE, JOHN FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 65.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927034 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751259.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509458 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:11:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MCNAMARA, NANCY ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less